EP1017838 - EXPRESSION OF GENES IN HEMATOPOIETIC STEM CELLS IN HISCHAEMIC CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford Biomedica (UK) Limited Medawar Centre, Robert Robinson Avenue, The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Oxford Biomedica (UK) Limited Medawar Centre, Robert Robinson Avenue, The Oxford Science Park Oxford 0X4 4GA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Claire, University of Sheffield Dept. of Pathology, Beech Hill Road Sheffield S10 2RX / GB | 02 /
BINLEY, Katie, Mary 17 Demesne Furze Headington, Oxford OX3 7XF / GB | 03 /
BEBBINGTON, Chris Berry Cottage, Westbrook Boxford, Newbury RG20 8DJ / GB | 04 /
NAYLOR, Stuart 64 Woodside Road Amersham, Bucks HP6 6AN / GB | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98946556.2 | 23.09.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998GB02885 | Priority number, date | GB19970020216 | 23.09.1997 Original published format: GB 9720216 | GB19970020465 | 25.09.1997 Original published format: GB 9720465 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9915684 | Date: | 01.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1017838 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C12N15/63, C12N5/10, A61K48/00 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,KR);
C12N5/0647 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N15/63 (EP,KR);
A61K48/00 (EP);
C12N2710/10343 (EP);
C12N2740/15022 (EP);
C12N2740/15043 (EP);
C12N2740/15052 (EP);
C12N2760/20122 (EP);
C12N2810/40 (EP);
C12N2810/60 (EP);
C12N2810/6054 (EP);
C12N2830/002 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Extension states | AL | 13.04.2000 | LT | 13.04.2000 | LV | 13.04.2000 | MK | 13.04.2000 | RO | 13.04.2000 | SI | 13.04.2000 | Title | German: | GENEXPRESSION IN HÄMOTOPOIETISCHEN STAMMZELLEN UNTER HISCHÄMISCHEN BEDINGUNGEN | [2000/28] | English: | EXPRESSION OF GENES IN HEMATOPOIETIC STEM CELLS IN HISCHAEMIC CONDITIONS | [2000/28] | French: | METHODE | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/46] | 23.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9302556 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US]) [X] 16 * abstract *; | [X]WO9506120 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [X] 9,10,16 * page 1, line 8 - line 13 * * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 22 * * page 5, line 17 - line 25 * * example 5 *; | [XY]WO9521927 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [X] 10 * abstract * * examples 1-11 * [Y] 1-7; | [XY]WO9529704 (FREEMAN SCOTT [US]) [X] 9,10,16 * abstract * * page 2, line 29 - line 30 * * page 11, line 5 - line 11 * * page 14, line 24 - line 29 * * page 19, line 7 - line 15 * * page 23, line 14 - page 25, line 18 * * page 31, line 12 - page 34, line 26 * [Y] 1-7; | [XY]WO9620276 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US], et al) [X] 13,14,16-18,20 * abstract * * page 5, line 22 - line 28 * * page 6, line 10 - line 24 * * page 11, line 15 - line 28 * * page 19, line 29 - page 24, line 14 * [Y] 8,11,12,15,19; | [PXD]WO9815294 (UNIV SHEFFIELD [GB], et al) [PXD] 1-7,9,10,16 * abstract ** examples 1-5 *; | [Y] - BILBAO G. ET AL., "Adenoviral/retroviral vector chimeras: a novel strategy to achieve high-efficiency stable transduction in vivo.", FASEB J., (19970711), vol. 11, pages 624 - 634, XP002091318 [Y] 8,11,12,15,19 * the whole document * | [A] - LEWIS J ET AL, "ROLE OF MACROPHAGES IN TUMOUR ANGIOGENESIS: REGULATION BY HYPOXIA", PATHOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND. MEETING, (19970702), vol. 182, page 1A, XP002056969 [A] 1-7,9,10,16 * the whole document * | [A] - HWU P. & ROSENBERG S.A., The use of gene-modified tumor-infiltrating lymphocytes for cancer therapy, NEW YORK, "GENE THERAPY FOR NEOPLASTIC DISEASES", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1994), XP002099947 [A] 1-7,9,10,16 * page 188 - page 199 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb21712.x | [A] - POUWELS P.H. ET AL., Cloning vectors (Laboratory manual), AMSTERDAM, ELSVIER, (1985), XP002099948 [A] 8 * pages VIII-1 - pages VIII-25 * | [A] - BORIS-LAWRIE K. & TEMIN H.M., The retroviral vector, NEW YORK, "GENE THERAPY FOR NEOPLASTIC DISEASES", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1994), XP002099949 [A] 8 * page 59 - page 71 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb21703.x |