EP1019759 - FLAT OPHTHALMIC LENS SYNTHESIZED FROM ITS SPECIFICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thieberger, Gil Hana Shenesh Street 22 36036 Kiryat Tivon / IL | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Papaharalabus, Catherine C. Evretechnika - C. Papaharalabus Law Offices, 23 Analipseos Street 152 35 Vrilisia / GR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Papaharalabus, Catherine C. Evretechnika - C. Papaharalabus Law Offices, 23 Analipseos Street 152 35 Vrilisia / GR | Application number, filing date | 98946691.7 | 27.09.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998IL00465 | Priority number, date | US19970060760P | 02.10.1997 Original published format: US 60760 P | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9918457 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1019759 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/00 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
G02B5/1895 (EP);
G02B5/1876 (EP);
G02C7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | AUF BASIS IHRER SPEZIFIKATIONEN HERGESTELLTE OPHTHALMISCHE LINSE | [2000/29] | English: | FLAT OPHTHALMIC LENS SYNTHESIZED FROM ITS SPECIFICATIONS | [2000/29] | French: | VERRE OPHTALMIQUE PLAT SYNTHETISE A PARTIR DE SES SPECIFICATIONS | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 15.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4070105 (MARZOUK MARZOUK YOUSSEF); | [X]US4340283 (COHEN ALLEN L); | [X]US4950057 (SHIRAYANAGI MORIYASU [JP]) |