Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0999823 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0999823



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1650
08.09.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.09.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.09.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
02.09.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
31.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.05.2011 English translation of the claims Opposition 12
31.05.2011 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
31.05.2011 German translation of the claims Opposition 17
31.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.03.2011 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
17.03.2011 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
17.03.2011 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
17.03.2011 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
10.01.2011 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.09.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.09.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.09.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.09.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 45
15.09.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 3
15.09.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.09.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.04.2010 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
15.04.2010 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
29.03.2010 Description Opposition 24
29.03.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
19.01.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
19.01.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
19.01.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.01.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.12.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
18.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.12.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 31
30.10.2009 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 27
24.09.2009 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 3
22.09.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
18.09.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 39
21.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
17.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
10.07.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.07.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
06.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
06.07.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
04.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.07.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
03.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.07.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.06.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
24.06.2009 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.06.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
24.06.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
10.06.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
06.06.2008 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
06.06.2008 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
06.06.2008 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.06.2008 Claims Appeal 10
06.06.2008 Claims Appeal 13
06.06.2008 Claims Appeal 10
06.06.2008 Claims Appeal 16
06.06.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
06.06.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
08.04.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
05.04.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.04.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
03.04.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.03.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.12.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
04.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.11.2007 F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds Appeal 1
29.11.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 5
15.11.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
17.10.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
12.09.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 48
11.09.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
07.09.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
10.08.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.07.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
07.07.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.07.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
29.06.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.06.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
27.06.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
07.05.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.05.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.05.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.05.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.05.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 21
02.05.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 24
02.05.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 21
02.05.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 21
02.05.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 21
02.05.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 21
02.05.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 24
02.05.2007 Annex to a communication Opposition 21
02.05.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
02.05.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.05.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
02.05.2007 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.05.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.05.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.05.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
02.05.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
02.05.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.05.2007 Text intended for grant Opposition 45
23.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.01.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
18.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2006 Claims Opposition 21
28.12.2006 Claims Opposition 21
28.12.2006 Claims Opposition 21
28.12.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
27.12.2006 Claims Opposition 21
27.12.2006 Claims Opposition 21
27.12.2006 Claims Opposition 21
27.12.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.12.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
06.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.08.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
10.08.2006 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.08.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.02.2006 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
08.11.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
31.10.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
27.10.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
25.10.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
05.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.08.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.08.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.08.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.08.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.08.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
28.07.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2005 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
21.04.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.04.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.04.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.03.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.03.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.03.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.03.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
18.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
18.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
18.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
18.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
16.03.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
15.03.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
15.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
15.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
15.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
15.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
07.05.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.03.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.03.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 26
31.03.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 23
24.02.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
16.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
13.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
17.10.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.10.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.10.2003 Preparation of grant Search / examination 1
17.10.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 55
25.08.2003 Claims Search / examination 16
25.08.2003 Claims Search / examination 23
25.08.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
14.08.2003 Request for further processing Search / examination 43
25.06.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.06.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
25.03.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.03.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.03.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.11.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.11.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.04.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.06.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.06.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 74
11.05.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.04.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
19.04.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 70