|
04.12.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.10.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.09.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2006 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
53 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
05.03.2001 |
Loss of priority right |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.03.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
24.11.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.09.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.09.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.09.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
29.10.1998 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
29.10.1998 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
29 |
|
29.10.1998 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |