|
29.04.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the International Representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
31.05.2007 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
16 |
|
16.02.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2006 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
23.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
23.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
23.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.03.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.09.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.05.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.04.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
12 |