EP1036951 - MAGNETIC BEARING DEVICE AND TURBO-MOLECULAR PUMP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/38] | MAGNETIC BEARING CONTROL DEVICE AND TURBO-MOLECULAR PUMP DEVICE | ||
[2008/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | [2009/09] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAIRA, Akiko Ebara Densan Ltd. 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8575 / JP | 02 /
CHINO, Hiroyuki Ebara Densan Ltd. 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8575 / JP | 03 /
NAKAZAWA, Toshiharu Ebara Densan Ltd. 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8575 / JP | 04 /
MIYAMOTO, Matsutaro Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/38] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98957125.2 | 02.12.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998JP05427 | Priority number, date | JP19970347131 | 02.12.1997 Original published format: JP 34713197 | JP19970361820 | 10.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36182097 | [2000/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928640 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036951 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036951 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16C32/04, F04D19/04, G08C19/02 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
F16C32/0446 (EP,US);
F16C32/04 (KR);
F04D19/048 (EP,US);
F16C2360/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/38] | Title | German: | MAGNETLAGERVORRICHTUNG UND TURBOMOLEKULARPUMPE | [2008/29] | English: | MAGNETIC BEARING DEVICE AND TURBO-MOLECULAR PUMP DEVICE | [2008/29] | French: | PALIER MAGNETIQUE ET DISPOSITIF A POMPE TURBOMOLECULAIRE | [2008/29] |
Former [2000/38] | MAGNETLAGERSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND TURBOMOLEKULARPUMPE | ||
Former [2000/38] | MAGNETIC BEARING CONTROL DEVICE AND TURBO-MOLECULAR PUMP DEVICE | ||
Former [2000/38] | ORGANE DE COMMANDE A PALIER MAGNETIQUE ET DISPOSITIF A POMPE TURBOMOLECULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2000 | Translation filed | 30.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 02.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]JPH01284701 ; | [AX]JPH07103232 ; | [XA]EP0597365 (LEYBOLD AG [DE]) [X] 4,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 9 * [A] 5; | [PX]EP0872655 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [PX] 2 * the whole document *; | [XA]JPH09189326 ; | [A]DE4114566 (LEYBOLD AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 17 *; | [A]JPH09242753 ; | [A]US3536418 (BREAUX ONEZIME P) [A] 4,5 * column 2, line 5 - line 19 * | [AX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900202), vol. 0140, no. 59, Database accession no. (P - 1000), & JP01284701 A 19891116 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * [X] 4 | [AX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07103232 A 19950418 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * [X] 2 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09189326 A 19970722 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 2 * abstract * [A] 1 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09242753 A 19970916 (EBARA CORP; EBARA DENSAN:KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH01224627 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]JPH08338393 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [A]JPH08338432 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD); | [A]JPH09189326 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [A]JPH09257035 (EBARA CORP, et al) |