|
26.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.05.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
30.03.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.03.2009 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
05.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.12.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition of an opponent not being appellant |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2005 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
68 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.08.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.09.1999 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
01.09.1999 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.08.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.08.1999 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
07.07.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.06.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.06.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
21 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
12 |