EP1027783 - METHODS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSMITTING DATA VIA A RADIO INTERFACE IN A RADIOCOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RITTER, Gerhard Mühlweg 1 D-86943 Thaining / DE | [2000/33] | Application number, filing date | 98959741.4 | 19.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998DE03061 | Priority number, date | DE1997147457 | 27.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19747457 | [2000/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9922483 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027783 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027783 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/04, H04B7/26 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
H04L25/0226 (EP,US);
H04L1/0078 (EP,US);
H04L7/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2000/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN ÜBER EINE FUNKSCHNITTSTELLE IN EINEM FUNK-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2000/33] | English: | METHODS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSMITTING DATA VIA A RADIO INTERFACE IN A RADIOCOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2000/33] | French: | PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UNE INTERFACE RADIO DANS UN SYSTEME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 17.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.08.2003 | [2004/04] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5185764 (BAIER ALFRED [DE]) [A] 11* abstract *; | [A]EP0535403 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,6,7,10 * abstract * * column 7, line 26 - line 51 *; | [A]EP0615352 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9611533 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0767557 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 42 - line 46 * |