EP1035818 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIDLUND, Urban Päronvägen 5 S-435 43 Mölnlycke / SE | 02 /
STEGER, Christina Eklanda Hage 49 S-431 49 Mölndal / SE | 03 /
HANSSON, Roy Alegardsgatan 112 S-431 50 Mölndal / SE | 04 /
ROXENDAL, Sofia Radavägen 28 S-435 43 Pixbo / SE | 05 /
WESSEL, Peter Mantalsgatan 26 S-442 52 Ytterby / SE | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Göteborgs Patentbyra Dahls AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 98960144.8 | 03.12.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998SE02215 | Priority number, date | SE19970004484 | 03.12.1997 Original published format: SE 9704484 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927876 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035818 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035818 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
A61F13/53717 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/53713 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/53747 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/5376 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/15406 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/530153 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL | [2000/38] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE | [2000/38] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.04.2002 | BE | 10.04.2002 | CH | 10.04.2002 | FI | 10.04.2002 | GR | 10.04.2002 | LI | 10.04.2002 | PT | 10.07.2002 | IE | 03.12.2002 | LU | 03.12.2002 | CY | 31.12.2002 | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.12.2002 | ||
LU | 03.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 10.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4360022 (USAMI AKIRA, et al); | [X]WO9309745 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [Y]US5382245 (THOMPSON HUGH A [US], et al); | [X]EP0686384 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [A]WO9600550 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |