EP1036205 - METHOD AND OXYGEN LANCE FOR INJECTING GASES INTO A METALLURGICAL TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Stahl AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2002/39] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Stahl AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | |||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Thyssen Krupp Stahl AG August-Thyssen-Strasse 1 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DITTRICH, Rainer Zu den Rehwiesen 6 D-47055 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
SCHÖLER, Horst-Dieter Schweizer Strasse 563 D-47058 Duisburg / DE | 03 /
PLOCH, Andreas Schlossstrasse 86 D-46535 Dinslaken / DE | 04 /
ZEIMES, Manfred Verbindungsstrasse 44 D-40723 Hilden / DE | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 98963387.0 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998DE03512 | Priority number, date | DE1997155876 | 04.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19755876 | [2000/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929915 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036205 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036205 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C21C7/10, C21C5/46, C21C5/52, C21C7/072 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
C21C7/10 (EP,KR,US);
C21C5/4606 (EP,US);
F27D2003/169 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BLASLANZE ZUM EINBLASEN VON GASEN IN METALLURGISCHE GEFÄSSE | [2000/38] | English: | METHOD AND OXYGEN LANCE FOR INJECTING GASES INTO A METALLURGICAL TANK | [2000/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET LANCE DE SOUFFLAGE POUR INJECTER DES GAZ DANS DES CUVES METALLURGIQUES | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 17.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8400176 (CADRE CORP [US]) [Y] 1,4,7,11 * abstract * * page 1, line 14 - line 19 * * page 5, line 1 - line 22 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 11 * * page 13, line 2 - line 21 * * page 22, line 7 - line 19 * * figures 1,5; claims 2,6,7,12,13 *; | [Y]US4730784 (BOCK ANDRE [LU], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,6,7,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 14 * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 19 * * column 2, line 50 - line 63 * * column 3, line 13 - line 44 * * claims 1,4,5,8-10 *; | [YA]FR2644558 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [Y] 7,11,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 12 * * page 2, line 15 - line 25 * * page 4, line 15 - line 21 * * figure -; claims 6,8-10 * [A] 8; | [A]DE4221266 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 7,9,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 22 ** claims 1,2,4,5,9 *; | [DYA]DE4442362 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [DY] 1,3,6,7,11,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 12 * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 49 * * figures 1,3; claim - * [A] 2,4,9,10,12; | [DY]EP0789083 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [DY] 1,4,7,11 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 8 * * page 2, line 18 - line 30 * * page 3, line 39 - line 46 * * page 6, line 25 - line 29 * * page 6, line 56 - page 7, line 5 * * page 7, line 40 - line 54 * * figures 1-4; claims 1-4,11,12 *; | [PXA]DE29807145U (TECHNOMETAL GES FUER METALLTEC [DE]) [PX] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 4 * * page 6 * * figure -; claims 1-3 * [A] 12 |