|
21.01.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.10.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.07.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.02.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
30.03.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.09.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
86 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.02.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.09.1999 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
12.08.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
05.08.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.08.1999 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
25.06.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.04.1999 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1998 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
22.12.1998 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |