EP1033922 - ELECTROMAGNETIC FIELD DEFLECTING GARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpini, Edilio Livio Via G. Gavotti, 1 27050 Pancarana / IT | [2000/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Petruzziello, Aldo Racheli S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Petruzziello, Aldo Racheli & C. s.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98964433.1 | 23.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998EP07556 | Priority number, date | IT1997MI02638 | 27.11.1997 Original published format: IT MI972638 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927807 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033922 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033922 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/00, G21F3/02, H05K9/00 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
A41D13/008 (EP,US);
G21F3/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24785 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3033 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES FELD ABLENKENDE BEKLEIDUNG | [2000/37] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC FIELD DEFLECTING GARMENT | [2000/37] | French: | VETEMENT DETOURNANT UN CHAMP ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [2000/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 07.11.2002 | [2003/46] | Cited in | International search | [YP]JPH10226908 ; | [YA]US5073984 (TONE MASASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-7B; claims 1,2,6,8 * [A] 9,11; | [A]DE29612459U (LANGE ALEXANDER [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9715931 (VIGNUDELLI ADRIANO [IT]) [A] 1-3* page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 2; figures 1-6; claims 1,2 *; | [A]FR2745690 (EGIS S A R L [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 17; claim 1 *; | [AP]DE19633315 (AHRENS WERNER [DE], et al) [AP] 1,11 * column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 44; figures 1-4 * | [YP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 098, no. 013, & JP10226908 A 19980825 (BLUE LOCK:KK) [YP] 1 * abstract * |