|
20.05.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.02.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
06.11.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
16 |
|
30.09.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.08.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.05.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.08.2006 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2006 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2004 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
06.01.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2003 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2003 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2003 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2000 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
23.08.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
23 |