EP1041982 - INHIBITION OF p38 KINASE ACTIVITY USING SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC UREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 555 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2009/32] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corp. 400 Morgan Lane West Haven, CT 06516 / US | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUMAS, Jacques 821 Beechwood Road Orange, CT 06477 / US | 02 /
KHIRE, Uday 101 Tanglewood Drive Hamden, CT 06518 / US | 03 /
LOWINGER, Timothy, B. 5-7, 1203 Chitose-cuo Nishinomiya, Hyogo 662-0046 / JP | 04 /
PAULSEN, Holger Pahlkestrasse 5 D-42115 Wuppertal / DE | 05 /
RIEDL, Bernd Von der Goltz Strasse 7 42329 Wuppertal / DE | 06 /
SCOTT, William, J. 210 Saddle Hill Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 07 /
SMITH, Roger, A. 65 Winterhill Road Madison, CT 06443 / US | 08 /
WOOD, Jill, E. 72 Pickwick Road Hamden, CT 06517 / US | 09 /
HATOUM-MOKDAD, Holia 43 Joseph Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | 10 /
JOHNSON, Jeffrey 58 Gould Lane Branford, CT 06405 / US | 11 /
LEE, Wendy 282 Evergreen Avenue Hamden, CT 06518 / US | 12 /
REDMAN, Aniko 66 E. Street Derby, CT 06418 / US | [2011/42] |
Former [2000/44] | 01 /
DUMAS, Jacques 821 Beechwood Road Orange, CT 06477 / US | ||
02 /
KHIRE, Uday 101 Tanglewood Drive Hamden, CT 06518 / US | |||
03 /
LOWINGER, Timothy, B. 5-7, 1203 Chitose-cuo Nishinmiya, Hyogo 662-0046 / JP | |||
04 /
PAULSEN, Holger Pahlkestrasse 5 D-42115 Wuppertal / DE | |||
05 /
RIEDL, Bernd Von der Goltz Strasse 7 42329 Wuppertal / DE | |||
06 /
SCOTT, William, J. 210 Saddle Hill Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | |||
07 /
SMITH, Roger, A. 65 Winterhill Road Madison, CT 06443 / US | |||
08 /
WOOD, Jill, E. 72 Pickwick Road Hamden, CT 06517 / US | |||
09 /
HATOUM-MOKDAD, Holia 43 Joseph Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | |||
10 /
JOHNSON, Jeffrey 58 Gould Lane Branford, CT 06405 / US | |||
11 /
LEE, Wendy 282 Evergreen Avenue Hamden, CT 06518 / US | |||
12 /
REDMAN, Aniko 66 E. Street Derby, CT 06418 / US | |||
Former [2000/41] | 01 /
DUMAS, Jacques 821 Beechwood Road Orange, CT 06477 / US | ||
02 /
KHIRE, Uday 101 Tanglewood Drive Hamden, CT 06518 / US | |||
03 /
LOWINGER, Timothy, B. 5-7, 1203 Chitose-cuo Nishinmiya, Hyogo 662-0046 / JP | |||
04 /
PAULSEN, Holger Pahlkestrasse 5 D-42115 Wuppertal / DE | |||
05 /
RIEDL, Bernd 13 Cedrus Court Branford, CT 06405 / US | |||
06 /
SCOTT, William, J. 210 Saddle Hill Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | |||
07 /
SMITH, Roger, A. 65 Winterhill Road Madison, CT 06443 / US | |||
08 /
WOOD, Jill, E. 72 Pickwick Road Hamden, CT 06517 / US | |||
09 /
HATOUM-MOKDAD, Holia 43 Joseph Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | |||
10 /
JOHNSON, Jeffrey 213 Leetes Island Road Branford, CT 06405 / US | |||
11 /
LEE, Wendy 282 Evergreen Avenue Hamden, CT 06518 / US | |||
12 /
REDMAN, Aniko 66 E. Street Derby, CT 06418 / US | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98964709.4 | 22.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998US26080 | Priority number, date | US19970995750 | 22.12.1997 Original published format: US 995750 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932111 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1041982 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1041982 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415, A61K31/4439, A61P29/00, A61P37/02 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/501 (EP);
A61K31/381 (EP);
A61K31/415 (EP);
A61K31/4155 (EP);
A61K31/42 (EP);
A61K31/421 (EP);
A61K31/422 (EP);
A61K31/426 (EP);
A61K31/427 (EP);
A61K31/428 (EP);
A61K31/433 (EP);
A61K31/4436 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP);
A61K31/444 (EP);
A61K31/4709 (EP);
A61K31/497 (EP);
A61K31/506 (EP);
A61K31/5377 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D231/42 (EP);
C07D261/14 (EP);
C07D277/48 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/41] | A61K31/415, A61K31/38, A61K31/385, A61K31/35 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Extension states | AL | 21.06.2000 | LT | 21.06.2000 | LV | 21.06.2000 | MK | 21.06.2000 | RO | 21.06.2000 | SI | 21.06.2000 | Title | German: | HEMMUNG DER p38 KINASE AKTIVITÄT DURCH SUBSTITUIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE HARNSTOFFE | [2011/21] | English: | INHIBITION OF p38 KINASE ACTIVITY USING SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC UREAS | [2000/41] | French: | INHIBITION DE L'ACTIVITE DE P38 KINASE AU MOYEN D'UREES HETEROCYCLIQUES SUBSTITUEES | [2000/41] |
Former [2000/41] | HEMMUNG DER p38 KINASE AKTIVITÄT DURCH SUBSTITUIERTEN HETEROCYCLISCHEN HARNSTOFFEN | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 26.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.2011 | BE | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | LU | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | IE | 22.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | GR | 20.01.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | [2013/29] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
LU | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 19.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3646059 (BRANTLEY RICHARD K) [A] 35 * the whole document *; | [A]US5162360 (CRESWELL MARK W [US], et al) [A] 35,36 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9507922 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,29-33 * page 1 - page 20 *; | [Y]US5559137 (ADAMS JERRY L [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,29-34 * the whole document, especially columns 11, 12, 17 and claims *; | [PX]WO9852941 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-6,29-34 * the whole document, especially page 7 lines 11-55, page 8 lines 1-20, page 56 *; | [PX]WO9852558 (BAYER AG [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,28-34 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO9852937 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [PY] 1-6,29-34 * the whole document, especially page 39 example 5 and page 41 example 8 *; | [PX]WO9856377 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-6,28-34 * the whole document, especially pages 6-8, page 11 line 29, pages 26-27, page 30 lines 8-16, claims 11,12 *; | [E]WO9923091 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US]) [E] 1-6,8,29,31-34 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9932110 (BAYER AG [US]) [E] 1-6,8,28-34 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9932106 (BAYER AG [US]) [E] 35,36 * page 73 example D4 and page 75 example D5a *; | [E]WO9932455 (BAYER AG [US]) [E] 35,36* page 4 lines 9-11,26-29; page 5 line 6; page 37 examples 38 and 39 *; | [Y] - HANSON G J, "inhibitors of p38 kinase", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS, GB, (199707), vol. 7, no. 7, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 729 - 733, XP002086152 [Y] 1-6,29-34 * the whole document, especially introduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.7.7.729 | International search | [A]US5319099 (KAMATA SUSUMU [JP], et al) | Examination | - BADGER ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1996), vol. 279, no. 3, pages 1453 - 1461 | - SHAPIRO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1995), vol. 92, pages 12230 - 12234 | - G. HANSON, EXP. OPIN. THER. PATENTS, (1997), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 729 - 733 | by applicant | WO9404157 | WO9507922 |