|
25.04.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
11 |
|
13.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.05.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
26.11.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
31.07.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
19.05.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
22 |
|
21.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
01.02.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
16.07.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.07.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.08.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
26.07.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
26.07.1999 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
49 |