|
07.02.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
29 |
|
05.06.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.05.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
22.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.01.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
25.11.2010 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
37 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.05.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
48 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.01.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2001 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.05.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
57 |