EP1054687 - EXPRESSION VECTORS AND CELL LINES EXPRESSING VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR D, AND METHOD OF TREATING MELANOMAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vegenics Limited Level 1 10 Wallace Avenue Toorak, Victoria 3142 / AU | [2008/27] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH 605 Third Avenue New York New York 10158 / US | ||
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH 605 Third Avenue New York, New York 10158 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACHEN, Marc, G. Unit 3, 38 Chapman Street North Melbourne, VIC 3051 / AU | 02 /
STACKER, Steven, Alan 30 McKean Street North Fizroy, VIC 3068 / AU | 03 /
ALITALO, Kari Nyyrikintie 4A FIN-02100 Espoo / FI | [2008/21] |
Former [2000/48] | 01 /
ACHEN, Marc, G. Unit 3 38 Chapman Street North Melbourne, VIC 3051 / AU | ||
02 /
STACKER, Steven, Alan 30 McKean Street North Fizroy, VIC 3068 / AU | |||
03 /
ALITALO, Kari Nyyrikintie 4A FIN-02100 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/45] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/48] | Harrison Goddard Foote Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98966053.5 | 23.12.1998 | [2000/48] | WO1998US27373 | Priority number, date | AU1997PP01131 | 24.12.1997 Original published format: AU PP113197 | US19980087392P | 29.05.1998 Original published format: US 87392 P | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9933485 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1054687 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1054687 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1054687 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/19, A61K39/395, C12N15/85, C12N5/16, C12N15/11, G01N33/574 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
C07K14/52 (EP,US);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61K38/1866 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/48] | A61K38/18, C07K14/475, C07K14/49, C12N5/10, C12N15/18, C12N15/63 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | EXPRESSIONSVEKTOREN UND ZELLINIEN ZUR EXPRESSION VON VASKULÄREM WACHSTUMSFAKTOR D, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MELANOMEN | [2000/48] | English: | EXPRESSION VECTORS AND CELL LINES EXPRESSING VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR D, AND METHOD OF TREATING MELANOMAS | [2000/48] | French: | VECTEURS D'EXPRESSION ET LIGNEES CELLULAIRES EXPRIMANT LE FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE ENDOTHELIAL VASCULAIRE D, ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES MELANOMES | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Request for further processing for: | 26.04.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 26.04.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2008 | BE | 21.05.2008 | CY | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | FI | 21.05.2008 | IT | 21.05.2008 | NL | 21.05.2008 | SE | 21.08.2008 | GR | 22.08.2008 | ES | 01.09.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | IE | 23.12.2008 | LU | 23.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/44] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CY | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 01.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9524473 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-16,22,24,25,28,32,36-44* see claims, page 4, page 16 last paragraph, pages 22 and 24-25 *; | [XP]WO9807832 (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al) [XP] 1-16,22,25,28,36-44 * see claims 1,8,14-16,25-33,37-39,46-50,58-59,65-69,74, page 8 lines 4-15, pages 9-10, page 13 lines 1-2, examples 8 and 13 *; | [XP]WO9824811 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [XP] 1-16,22,24,25,32,33,36-44 * see pages 3-5, page 32 lines 12-24, pages 35-36 *; | [E]EP0935001 (CHUGAI RES INST MOLECULAR MED [JP]) [E] 1-8,13,14,25,31,36 * see claims 1-9, paragraphs [0022] and [0026] * | International search | [X] - YAMADA Y, ET AL., "MOLECULAR CLONING OF A NOVEL VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR, VEGF-D", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO., US, US, (19970101), vol. 42, doi:10.1006/geno.1997.4774, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 483 - 488, XP002918205 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1997.4774 | [X] - ORLANDINI M, ET AL., "IDENTIFICATION OF A C-FOS-INDUCED GENE THAT IS RELATED TO THE PLATELET-DERIVED GROWTH FACTOR/VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR FAMILY", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19961001), vol. 93, doi:10.1073/pnas.93.21.11675, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11675 - 11680, XP002918340 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.21.11675 |