EP1045830 - ALPHA-AMINOAMIDE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS ANALGESIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A. Via Ariosto, 21 20091 Bresso (MI) / IT | [2003/03] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A. Via R. Lepetit 34 21040 Gerenzano (Varese) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEVARELLO, Paolo Piazza San Pietro in Ciel d'Oro, 7/A I-27100 Pavia / IT | 02 /
VARASI, Mario Via Giambellino, 80 I-20146 Milan / IT | 03 /
SALVATI, Patricia Via Valera, 16/C I-20020 Arese / IT | 04 /
POST, Claes Nässelvägen 5 S-193 34 Sigtuna / SE | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Sgarbi, Renato, et al Giambrocono & C. s.p.a. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Sgarbi, Renato, et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98966617.7 | 12.12.1998 | [2000/43] | WO1998EP08157 | Priority number, date | GB19970027523 | 31.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9727523 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935125 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045830 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045830 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/54, A61K31/165 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
C07C237/06 (EP,US);
C07C255/54 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | ALPHA-AMINOAMIDDERIVATE DIE ALS ANALGETISCHE MITTEL NÜTZLICH SIND | [2000/43] | English: | ALPHA-AMINOAMIDE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS ANALGESIC AGENTS | [2000/43] | French: | DERIVES ALPHA-AMINOAMIDES UTILES EN TANT QU'AGENTS ANALGESIQUES | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2059963 (ROBINS CO INC A H) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - line 50; example -; claim - *; | [DA]WO9014334 (ERBA CARLO SPA [IT]) [DA] 1-12 * page 1, line 21 - page 3, line 7; example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0525360 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 25; example -; claim - *; | [DA]WO9705102 (PHARMACIA & UPJOHN SPA [IT], et al) [DA] 1-12* page 1, line 1 - line 26; example -; claim - *; | [PX] - PAOLO PEVARELLO ET AL., "Synthesis and Anticonvulsant Activity of a New Class of 2-[(Arylalkyl)amino]alkanamide Derivatives", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., WASHINGTON US, (19980212), vol. 41, no. 4, pages 579 - 590, XP002101390 [PX] 7-11 * see page 580, column 1, scheme 1; page 582, table 2, entry 60; page 583, column 2, table 5, entry 60; page 587, column 1, lines 36 - 45 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970599m |