|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
36 |
|
15.07.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
31.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
20.05.2010 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.02.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
26.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
51 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
52 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
42 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
42 |
|
15.10.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.02.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2002 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.01.2002 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2001 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2000 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
26.07.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.04.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.04.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.03.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
14 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
14 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
14 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.10.1999 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.10.1999 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
30.09.1999 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.09.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.09.1999 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.07.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.06.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
30 |