EP0938988 - Spring support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing. H.C. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rispeter, Siegfried Uhlandstrasse 13 74354 Besigheim / DE | 02 /
Lauer, Jürgen Hofmeisterstrasse 9 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/35] | Application number, filing date | 99100484.7 | 12.01.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | DE1998108021 | 26.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19808021 | [1999/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0938988 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0938988 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938988 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60G15/06 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
B60G21/0551 (EP,US);
B60G15/063 (EP,US);
B60G2202/312 (EP,US);
B60G2204/1224 (EP,US);
B60G2204/1242 (EP,US);
B60G2204/418 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/08] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Federabstützung | [1999/35] | English: | Spring support | [1999/35] | French: | Support pour ressort | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3892397 (NICHOLLS LAWRENCE GEORGE) [A] 1 * column 1, line 45 - line 56; figure 4 *; | [DA]DE8802370U (FICHTEL UND SACHS AG) [DA] 1,3* figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4771996 (MARTINEZ JR GUILLERMO [US], et al) [Y] 5 * figures 3-5 * * column 4, line 56 - line 65; claim 2 *; | [Y]DE4129645 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4129644 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 3 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5326084 (MEVISSEN PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,6 * * column 1, line 36 - line 43 * * column 2, line 44 - line 45 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 5 *; | [Y]GB2283711 (ACG FRANCE [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,5 * figures 1,6,8 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 2; claim 3 *; | [A]DE19632183 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE8802370U |