|
13.02.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.07.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
24.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
09.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.06.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2000 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1999 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |