|
24.08.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
42 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.09.2007 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
61 |
|
20.09.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Description |
Opposition |
17 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Description |
Opposition |
17 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Filing of a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1999 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.1999 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.1999 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
30.08.1999 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1999 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
23.06.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |