EP0964457 - Solar cell module and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hidenori, Shiotsuka Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tsutomu, Murakami Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takehito, Yoshino Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Koji, Tsuzuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Ichiro, Kataoka Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Satoru, Yamada Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Yoshifumi, Takeyama Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Koichi, Shimizu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 09 /
Shigeo, Kiso Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 10 /
Hideaki, Zenko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/50] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99111423.2 | 11.06.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | JP19980179811 | 12.06.1998 Original published format: JP 17981198 | JP19990015087 | 25.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1508799 | JP19990160549 | 08.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16054999 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0964457 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0964457 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/048, H01L31/042 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H01L31/0392 (EP,US);
B32B15/088 (EP,US);
B32B15/09 (EP,US);
B32B17/04 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,US);
H01L31/02 (EP,US);
H01L31/03926 (EP,US);
H01L31/048 (EP,US);
H02S20/23 (EP,US);
H02S40/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2007/05] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Solarzellenmodul und sein Herstellungsverfahren | [1999/50] | English: | Solar cell module and method of manufacturing the same | [1999/50] | French: | Module de cellules solaires et son procédé de fabrication | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5741370 (HANOKA JACK I [US]) [Y] 1,5 * column 1, lines 18-42 * * column 5, lines 8-31; figures 1A-1C *; | [Y]US5401561 (FISUN OLEG I [RU], et al) [Y] 1,5 * column 2, line 3 - column 5, line 10 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 25; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB1231961 (VEB ELEKTROMAT) [A] 2,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4896034 (KIRISEKO TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 17 * * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 11; figures 3-6 * |