Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0977132 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1088
25.03.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.03.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 2
20.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.02.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 32
17.02.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
25.07.2014 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 14
25.07.2014 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 14
18.06.2014 Claims Appeal 8
18.06.2014 Claims Appeal 9
18.06.2014 Claims Appeal 9
18.06.2014 Claims Appeal 7
18.06.2014 Claims Appeal 9
18.06.2014 Claims Appeal 7
18.06.2014 Claims Appeal 8
18.06.2014 Claims Appeal 9
18.06.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
18.06.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 74
08.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 22
06.05.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.05.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.04.2014 Annex Appeal 13
30.04.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
30.04.2014 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 13
28.04.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
11.11.2013 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
12.01.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.08.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.06.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.06.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
25.05.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 45
13.03.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
30.01.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.01.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 18
26.01.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 18
26.01.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 18
26.01.2009 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
26.01.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
26.01.2009 Means of redress Search / examination 2
16.01.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
16.01.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
16.01.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
16.01.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 17
16.01.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.01.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.01.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.01.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.01.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.12.2008 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
19.12.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
17.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
17.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
17.11.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
10.10.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.10.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
06.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.09.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.08.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
02.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 18
02.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.11.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 7
03.11.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 11
03.11.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
03.11.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 7
03.11.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
03.11.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.06.2003 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.01.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.12.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
03.12.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.12.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
05.10.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.08.2001 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
31.08.2001 Translation of priority document Search / examination 159
31.08.2001 Translation of priority document Search / examination 174
22.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 17
26.07.1999 Description Search / examination 140
26.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 82
26.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6