EP1078576 - Coffee aroma recovery process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. P.O.Box 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [2001/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furrer, Marc Ch. de l'Ancien Stand 2 1807 Blonay / CH | 02 /
Gretsch, Catherine 1412 Valeyres-sous-Ursins VD / CH | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Alain, et al 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [2004/05] |
Former [2001/09] | McConnell, Bruce Robert Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 99116494.8 | 23.08.1999 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078576 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/48 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
A23F5/486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Kaffeearoma | [2001/09] | English: | Coffee aroma recovery process | [2001/09] | French: | Procédé de récupération d'arôme de café | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 17.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/05] | 02.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4707368 (G. VOGEL) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 15; claims 1-5 *; | [X]US4100306 (R. GREGG) [X] 1,3,8 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 15; example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US4100305 (R. GREGG) [X] 1,3,8 * example I; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0489401 (JACOBS SUCHARD) [X] 1-3,6,8 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0043667 (THE PROCTER & GAMBLE CO) [X] 1,3,6,8,10 * claims 1,3-6 *; | [X]FR2218059 (THE PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1,2,6,10 * example 1; claim 1; table I *; | [XD]US3535118 (P. KLEIN) [XD] 1,6,8 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 13 *; | [X]EP0294177 (UNILEVER) [X] 1,2,6,8,10 * page 1, line 5 - line 21; example 1; claims 3,4 *; | [XA]FR614919 (INTERNATIONALE NAHRUNGS- UND GENUSSMITTEL AG) [X] 1,3,6,8 * page 2, line 94 - page 3, line 40; claim . * [A] 4,5 |