EP0985546 - Surface protective agent, and fountain solution composition for lithographic printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Hiroshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Harada, Yasue Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99117466.5 | 09.09.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | JP19980254732 | 09.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25473298 | JP19980271677 | 25.09.1998 Original published format: JP 27167798 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0985546 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41N3/08 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
B41N3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/48] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mittel zum Oberflächenschutz und Feuchtigkeitslösung für Flachdruckplatte | [2000/11] | English: | Surface protective agent, and fountain solution composition for lithographic printing plate | [2000/11] | French: | Agent de protection de surface, et solution de mouillage pour plaques d'impression lithographique | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 16.09.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 30.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/20] | 10.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5714302 (URASAKI JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 7 - line 9 * * column 3, line 10 - line 36 *; | [A]EP0304662 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * page 3 - page 4 *; | [A]EP0504916 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 17 - line 27 * * claims 1,4 *; | [A]US5126068 (BURKE JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 7 - line 17 * |