EP1101628 - Printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Malagoli, Luciano Via Monte Cantiere, 166 41028 Faeto di Serramazzoni (Modena) / IT | For all designated states Malagoli, Matteo Via Monte Cantiere, 166 41028 Faeto di Serramazzoni / IT | For all designated states Malagoli, Marco Via Brescia, 43 41100 Modena / IT | For all designated states Malagoli, Michela Via Brescia, 43 41100 Modena / IT | [2001/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Crugnola, Pietro Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Crugnola, Pietro Luppi & Crugnola S.r.l. Viale Corassori, 54 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 99119608.0 | 03.10.1999 | [2001/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1101628 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00, B41M3/00, B41M3/14, G03G8/00, B44C3/02, B42D15/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
B44C3/025 (EP);
B41M3/006 (EP);
B41M3/14 (EP);
B41M7/0027 (EP);
B42D25/29 (EP);
G03G8/00 (EP);
B41M7/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/08] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckverfahren | [2001/21] | English: | Printing method | [2001/21] | French: | Méthode d'impression | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/38] | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.01.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2259888 (MARKEM SYST LTD) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 5 *; | [X]EP0191592 (WOLSTENHOLME RINK PLC) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 33 - page 10, line 1 *; | [X]WO9008041 (PAYNE J M INNOVATORS) [X] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 4 *; | [X]JPH082098 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 10, Database accession no. 1996-093312, XP002130915 & JPH082098 A 19960109 (YUFUJI Y) [X] 1-15 * abstract * |