|
14.10.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.10.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.05.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.01.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
89 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.09.2012 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.03.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
62 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.06.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
03.06.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.06.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2001 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |