EP0994480 - Information recording medium, apparatus and method for recording or reproducing data thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Tomoyuki 6-6-101, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0021 / JP | 02 /
Murase, Kaoru 2-8-29-105, Meyasukita, Ikaruga-cho Ikoma-gun, Nara 636-0133 / JP | 03 /
Tsuga, Kazuhiro 9-33, Hanayashiki-tsutsujigaoka Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0803 / JP | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120133.6 | 08.10.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | JP19980289089 | 12.10.1998 Original published format: JP 28908998 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994480 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0994480 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, H04N5/85, G11B20/12, G11B27/30 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
G11B27/322 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (KR);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2541 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2575 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/01] |
Former [2000/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Datenaufzeichnung oder Datenwiedergabe | [2001/14] | English: | Information recording medium, apparatus and method for recording or reproducing data thereof | [2000/16] | French: | Support d'enregistrement d'informations, appareil et procédé d'enregistrement ou de réproduction de données dudit support | [2000/16] |
Former [2000/16] | Informationsaufzeichungsmedium, Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Datenaufzeichnung oder Datenwiedergabe | Examination procedure | 26.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 29.10.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.03.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP00124137.1 / EP1087402 | EP01104838.6 / EP1111613 | EP03000376.8 / EP1300851 | EP09162473.4 / EP2096640 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0737975 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-6,11-13,15,16 * column 14, line 32 - column 20, line 15 *; | [A]US5742569 (YAMAMOTO KAORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,6,11-13,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0788105 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6,12,15 * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 37 *; | [A]EP0737009 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-6,11-13,15,16 * column 14, line 13 - column 18, line 43 *; | [PA]EP0903738 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-4 * page 7, lines 20-58 * |