EP1026425 - Shift lever system of automatic transmission for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY 140-2, Kye-dong, Chongro-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Hyundai Motor Company 140-2, Kye-dong, Chongro-gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Hyundai Motor Company 140-2, Kye-dong, Jongro-ku Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Won-Jin Hyundai Apt. 103-802, Namyang-ri, Namyang-myeon Hwaseong-kun, Kyungki-do, Korea / KR | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120783.8 | 20.10.1999 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | KR19990004062 | 06.02.1999 Original published format: KR 9904062 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1026425 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1026425 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/10 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
F16H59/10 (EP,US);
B60K20/02 (KR);
Y10T74/2003 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20128 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20159 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20636 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/17] |
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schalthebel für ein Automatgetriebe eines Kraftsfahrzeugs | [2000/32] | English: | Shift lever system of automatic transmission for vehicle | [2000/32] | French: | Sélecteur de vitesse pour un véhicule équipé d'une boîte de vitesses automatique | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 08.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4630499 (HOPKINS ALLAN S [GB]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 30 - line 43 * * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 10 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US3292450 (HURST GEORGE H, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3768329 (COMER G, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH06278487 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06278487 A 19941004 (KOJIMA PRESS CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,19 * |