EP1002917 - Bolt actuating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2000/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pajak, Peter Siegfried Schulweg 68 42349 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Schlosshauer, Andreas Klaus Buchfinkenweg 14 53123 Bonn / DE | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122422.1 | 10.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | DE19981053056 | 17.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19853056 | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002917 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
E05B77/265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/06] |
Former [2000/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Riegelbetätigungsvorrichtung | [2000/21] | English: | Bolt actuating device | [2000/21] | French: | Dispositif d'actionnement d'un pène | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 03.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0388935 (AISIN SEIKI K.K) [X] 1-3,6-8,13 * abstract * [A] 4; | [XA]US5092638 (MIZUKI) [X] 1-3,5,7,13 * the whole document * [A] 4,6; | [XA]US3923329 (TORII ET AL) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2-12; | [XA]GB2301143 (KIEKERT AG) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2-12; | [PXA]GB2332235 (MERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS UK LTD) [PX] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2-12 |