|
08.12.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
06.11.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.05.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Appeal |
16 |
|
30.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.03.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
87 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.01.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2003 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |