EP1013543 - Light emission device suitable for bicycle taillight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATEYE CO., LTD. 8-25 Kuwazu 2-chome Higashisumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states CATEYE Co., Ltd. 8-25 Kuwazu 2-chome Higashisumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shoji, Masao 2810, Yamada, Taishi-cho Minamikawachi-gun, Osaka 583-0992 / JP | 02 /
Fujimoto, Takuya 2-27-36, Houzyo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 593-8302 / JP | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99125220.6 | 17.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | JP19980367702 | 24.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36770298 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013543 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013543 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62J6/04, B60Q1/26, F21K7/00, F21V5/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
F21V5/00 (EP,US);
B62J6/04 (EP,US);
F21W2107/13 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lichtemittierende Einrichtung für das Rücklicht eines Fahrrades | [2000/26] | English: | Light emission device suitable for bicycle taillight | [2000/26] | French: | Dispositif émetteur de lumière pour feu arrière de bicyclette | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 12.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 20.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH682142 (VER DRAHTWERKE AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4433882 (BUSCH & MUELLER [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4224061 (BUSCH & MUELLER FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5173810 (YAMAKAWA MASAMI [JP]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 * | Examination | EP0940331 |