EP0935279 - Device and method for load locking for semiconductor processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/32] | Device and method for load locking for semiconductuctor processing | ||
[1999/49] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASM JAPAN K.K. 23-1, 6-chome, Nagayama Tama-shi Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states ASM JAPAN K.K. 23-1, 6-chome, Nagayama Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kyogoku, Mitsusuke, c/o ASM Japan K.K. 23-1, Nagayama 6-chome Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1999/32] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99200381.4 | 09.02.1999 | [1999/32] | Priority number, date | JP19980041011 | 09.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4101198 | [1999/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0935279 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0935279 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
H01L21/67748 (EP,US);
H01L21/67751 (EP,US);
H01L21/68 (KR);
Y10S414/137 (EP,US);
Y10S414/139 (EP,US);
Y10S414/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/34] |
Former [1999/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für Ladungsschleuse in der Halbleiterfertigung | [1999/32] | English: | Device and method for load locking for semiconductor processing | [1999/49] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour sas de chargement dans la fabrication de semiconducteur | [1999/32] |
Former [1999/32] | Device and method for load locking for semiconductuctor processing | Examination procedure | 26.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 27.05.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.09.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 27.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0272141 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 14, lines 39-57 * [A] 7-9; | [A]WO9730470 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * column 15, line 15 - column 16, line 27 *; | [A]US5223001 (SAEKI HIROAKI [JP]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1-3 *; | [AP]JPH10214871 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10214871 A 19980811 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC) [AP] 1,7 * abstract * |