EP0936778 - Digital data transfer apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Steven J. 6 Tiffany Trail Hopkinton, Massachussetts 01748 / US | 02 /
Burkhardt, Henry III 7 Gales Point Manchester, Massachussetts 01944 / US | 03 /
Weber, Frederick D. 28 Hurlbut Street Cambridge, Massachussetts 02138 / US | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1999/33] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99201131.2 | 24.11.1988 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | US19870136701 | 22.12.1987 Original published format: US 136701 | [1999/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936778 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/433 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
G06F15/17337 (EP);
H04L12/433 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1999/33] | Title | German: | Digitale Datenübertragungsvorrichtung | [1999/33] | English: | Digital data transfer apparatus | [1999/33] | French: | Appareil de transfer de données digitales | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 21.11.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88311138.7 / EP0322116 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59103166 ; | [A]US4193121 (FEDIDA SAMUEL [GB], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US4468733 (OKA TOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [XA]US4510492 (MORI KINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 65 * * abstract * [A] 2-18 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841005), vol. 8, no. 219, Database accession no. (P - 306), & JP59103166 A 19840614 (K. NOBUAKI) [A] 1 * abstract * |