|
26.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
24.07.2006 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.01.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.01.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
11.06.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.01.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
22.09.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1999 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1999 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1999 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |