blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0997167

EP0997167 - Sports device with relatively rotating frames [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.10.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.12.2003  [2003/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thut, Rolf, Dipl. Arch. HTL/STV
Hombergstrasse 22
5000 Aarau / CH
[2000/18]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Spierenburg, Pieter
Spierenburg & Partner AG
Patent- und Markenanwälte
Mellingerstrasse 12
5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Spierenburg, Pieter
Spierenburg Helmle-Kolb & Partner AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Mellingerstrasse 12
5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH
Application number, filing date99203581.629.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateCH1998000218429.10.1998         Original published format: CH 218498
[2000/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0997167
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:A63B19/04
[2000/18]
CPC:
A63B19/04 (EP); A63B21/0051 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:Sportgerät mit zueinander drehbaren Rahmen[2000/18]
English:Sports device with relatively rotating frames[2000/18]
French:Appareil de sport à cadres relativement rotatifs[2000/18]
Examination procedure02.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
14.02.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/51]
15.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR982576  (PEYROT) [X] 1-3,8 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3276777  (PRUITT SR ARNOLD W) [X] 1-3,8,9 * column W *;
 [X]FR1159660  (SHIMADA) [X] 1-4,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4402500  (COLES WILLIAM E [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8 * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 17; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]WO9700661  (KINETECS INC [US]) [X] 1,4-8 * page 95, line 6 - page 113, line 14; figure 79 *;
 [A]US3936047  (BRANDT WILLIAM E, et al) [A] 1-3,8-11 * column 3, line 4 - line 45; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5254061  (LEASK JOHN C [US]) [A] 4,7 * column W *;
 [A]EP0183635  (TORO CO [US]) [A] 7 * page 17, line 16 - page 23, line 21; figures 1-9 *
by applicantUS5342244
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.