EP1092748 - Stabilized flame retardant additives and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US | [2001/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Schryver, Daniel A. Eksterveldlaan 75 2820 Bonheiden / BE | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99250363.1 | 15.10.1999 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092748 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/02, C08K5/03, C08K5/06, C08K5/58, C08K3/34 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K5/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/03 (EP,US);
C08K5/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/02] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stabilisierte Flammschutzadditive und deren Verwendung | [2001/16] | English: | Stabilized flame retardant additives and their use | [2001/16] | French: | Additives ignifuges stabilisés et leurs utilisations | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 19.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 20.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 03.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.12.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9816579 (ALBEMARLE CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7,11,17,21-25 * example 6; claims 1,9,10; table 3 *; | [Y]EP0416843 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5,8,11,17-19,21-28 * example -; claims 1-3,7 *; | [Y]JPS62250045 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 49, Database accession no. 1987-345602, XP002133593 & JPS62250045 A 19871030 (NITTO KASEI CO LTD) [Y] 1-5,8,11,17-19,21-28 * abstract * |