|
04.01.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.12.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
20 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.05.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2016 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.04.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
27.04.1999 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
39 |