EP0941762 - Supported acid catalyst comprising an amino compound and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fougret, Christoph Martin, BP Chemicals Limited Grangemouth Works, PO Box 21, Bo'ness Road Grangemouth, Stirlingshire FK3 9XH / GB | 02 /
Holderich, Wolfgang Friederich Mannheimer Strasse 18c 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Smith, Julian Philip Howard BP International Limited Patents & Agreements Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard BP International Limited, Group Patents & Agreements, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301609.6 | 03.03.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | GB19980005107 | 10.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9805107 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941762 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J27/16, B01J27/188, C07C29/04, B01J31/02 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
C07C29/04 (EP,US);
B01J31/18 (KR);
B01J27/16 (EP,US);
B01J27/182 (EP,US);
B01J27/188 (EP,US);
B01J31/0254 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/04, C07C31/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/21] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Amino-Verbindung enthaltender saurer Trägerkatalysator und dessen Verwendung | [1999/37] | English: | Supported acid catalyst comprising an amino compound and use thereof | [1999/37] | French: | Catalyseur acide supporté comprenant un composé amino et son utilisation | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 02.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/16] | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3758615 (IZUMI Y, et al) [DA] 1,2,4,12-19 * column A * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 7 * * example 1, run 30 *; | [X]EP0002899 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO [GB]) [X] 1,6,9-11,19,21 * abstract * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 2; example 1 *; | [A]GB1564223 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [A] 1-3,5-8,12-18* page 1, line 6 - line 10; examples I,II *; | [X]WO9421583 (SOLVAY INTEROX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * page 4, line 12 - line 32 * * page 5, line 3 - line 19 *; | [A]EP0704240 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,4-8,12-18 * abstract * * page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 19 * * page 3, line 32 - line 43 *; | [X]EP0771781 (SUN CO INC R & M [US]) [X] 1,2,4-11,19,20 * page 8, line 26 - line 32 * * page 11, bottom row of table *; | [A]US5681973 (HOELDERICH WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4,9-11,19 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 40; figure 1 * |