|
24.09.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
33 |
|
10.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.08.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.08.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2009 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
11.08.2009 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
30.07.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2009 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2009 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.01.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.09.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.09.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.09.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
29.09.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
29.09.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
29.09.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
27.09.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.05.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
33 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
67 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.02.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.02.2005 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
12.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
27.05.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
04.03.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |