EP0941863 - Recording sheet package, correction information sheet for the same, and thermal printer for use therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishizuka, Yoshio Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakamura Minami-Asigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Hidemi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 3-13-45 Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Fujishiro, Takeshi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 3-13-45 Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Inui, Fuyuki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 3-13-45 Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama / JP | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Jason Paul, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Stevens, Jason Paul, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1999/37] | Leale, Robin George Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301718.5 | 08.03.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | JP19980058198 | 10.03.1998 Original published format: JP 5819898 | JP19980072458 | 20.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7245898 | JP19980343411 | 02.12.1998 Original published format: JP 34341198 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0941863 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0941863 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J13/10 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
B41J13/0081 (EP,US);
B41J13/103 (EP,US);
B65H2405/311 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S462/90 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/17] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsbögenpackung, Korrekturinformationsblatt dafür und dafür geeigneter Thermodrucker | [1999/37] | English: | Recording sheet package, correction information sheet for the same, and thermal printer for use therewith | [1999/37] | French: | Emballage de feuilles d'enregistrement, feuille de correction d'information pour cet emballage et imprimante thermique l'utilisant | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 12.02.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/48] | 04.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/49] | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/49] | Divisional application(s) | EP05010241.7 / EP1561585 | EP05010369.6 / EP1561586 | Request for further processing for: | 15.02.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 15.02.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.03.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4854160 (GLATT OTTO G [US]) [A] 1,6,8-11 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph L - column 5, line 19 *; | [DA]JPH05116774 ; | [A]JPS6113117 ; | [A]JPS62249849 ; | [A]JPH01317924 ; | [A]JPH09234899 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 32; | US6018355 [ ] (KUWABARA TAKAO [JP]) [ ] * column 5, line 46 - line 54 * * column 6, line 40 - line 47 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930903), vol. 017, no. 486, Database accession no. (M - 1473), & JP05116774 A 19930514 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860607), vol. 010, no. 160, Database accession no. (P - 465), & JP61013117 A 19860121 (MATSUMOTO KOUSAN KK) [A] 11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880415), vol. 012, no. 121, Database accession no. (M - 686), & JP62249849 A 19871030 (CANON INC) [A] 17,27 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900307), vol. 014, no. 121, Database accession no. (M - 0946), & JP01317924 A 19891222 (CANON INC) [A] 17,27,37 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH05116774 |