EP0959585 - A dynamically scalable conference system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Catanzaro, Anthony James 155 Cassville Road Jackson, New Jersey 08527 / US | 02 /
Khalatian, Igor 26 Berkley Court Morganville, New Jersey 07751 / US | 03 /
Corn, Steven Jeffrey 221 Round Hill Drive Freehold, New Jersey 07728 / US | 04 /
Sajja, Vinod K. 169 Jordans Circle Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [1999/47] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303633.4 | 10.05.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | US19980083408 | 22.05.1998 Original published format: US 83408 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0959585 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
H04L65/403 (EP,US);
H04L12/1813 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04M3/56 (EP,US);
H04M3/562 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dynamisch skalierbares Konferenzsystem | [1999/47] | English: | A dynamically scalable conference system | [1999/47] | French: | Système de conférence dynamiquement échelonnable | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |