EP0998132 - Color data conversion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Masayoshi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Mori, Masahiro, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Shoji, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Semba, Satoshi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305591.2 | 14.07.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | JP19980304418 | 26.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30441898 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0998132 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0998132 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0998132 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
H04N1/6058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/15] |
Former [2000/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Farbdatenumwandlung | [2000/18] | English: | Color data conversion | [2000/18] | French: | Conversion des données de couleur | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.02.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0961488 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * figure 19 *; | [A]US5724443 (NISHIKAWA YOSHIAKI [JP]); | [A]US5712925 (OHGA MANABU [JP]); | [A]US5583666 (ELLSON RICHARD N [US], et al); | [A]US5699491 (BARZEL RON [US]) | [X] - MOROVIC J; LUO R, "A Universal Algorithm for Colour Gamut Mapping", COLOUR IMAGING MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCE, Derby, UK, (19980327), URL: http://colour.derby.ac.uk/jan/morCIM98.pdf, (20020327), XP002194635 [X] 1 * Section 4.1, Figure 8 * | [A] - GENTILE R S ET AL, "A COMPARISON OF TECHNIQUES FOR COLOR GAMUT MISMATCH COMPENSATION", JOURNAL OF IMAGING TECHNOLOGY, SOC. FOR IMAGING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGFIELD, VA, US, (19901001), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 176 - 181, XP000167934 |