|
12.04.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2001 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
31.03.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |