EP1014738 - A method and apparatus for efficient bandwith usage in a packet switching network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8TH FLOOR Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tseng, Yichyun 3908 Hogan Manor Drive Plano, Texas 75025 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2000/26] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310243.3 | 20.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | US19980218774 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: US 218774 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1014738 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1014738 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30, H04Q11/04 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H04W88/181 (EP);
H04Q11/0478 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/49] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur effizienten Bandbreitennutzung in einem Paketvermittlungsnetz | [2000/26] | English: | A method and apparatus for efficient bandwith usage in a packet switching network | [2000/26] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'utilisation efficace de la bande passante dans réseau à commutation par paquets | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0750441 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1,5 * column 10, line 3 - column 11, line 13 * * column 12, line 49 - column 13, line 54 * * column 14, line 30 - column 15, line 29 * * column 16, line 44 - line 59 *; | [DA]US5768308 (RABIPOUR RAFI ET AL) [DA] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5513181 (LOUGHRAN KEVIN ET AL) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 37 - line 52 * * column 4, line 20 - column 6, line 40 * |