EP0992907 - Trace fifo management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
GB
IT
NL
SE
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75243 / US | For:FR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE 821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For:DE
GB
IT
NL
SE
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75243 / US | ||
For:FR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE 821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR | |||
Former [2005/18] | For:DE
GB
IT
NL
SE
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | ||
For:FR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE 821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR | |||
Former [2003/39] | For:DE
GB
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | ||
For:FR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE 821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR | |||
Former [2000/15] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
AT
CY
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | ||
For:FR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE 821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buser, Mark L. 329 Dewey Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US | 02 /
Laurenti, Gilbert (nmi) 1490, chemin de Saint Etienne 06570 Saint Paul de Vence / FR | 03 /
Ganesh, N.M 3430 Warburton, Avenue #10 Santa Carla, CA 95051 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2003/27] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Ltd., European Patents Dept. MS/13, 800 Pavillion Drive, Northampton Business Park Northampton, Northamptonshire NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2000/15] | Potter, Julian Mark, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99400559.3 | 08.03.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | EP19980402455 | 06.10.1998 Original published format: EP 98402455 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0992907 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0992907 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0992907 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/36 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G06F7/764 (EP,US);
G06F11/348 (EP,US);
G06F5/01 (EP,US);
G06F7/607 (EP,US);
G06F7/74 (EP,US);
G06F7/762 (EP,US);
G06F9/30018 (EP,US);
G06F9/30032 (EP,US);
G06F9/30065 (EP,US);
G06F9/30149 (EP,US);
G06F9/30181 (EP,US);
G06F9/32 (EP,US);
G06F9/321 (EP,US);
G06F9/3552 (EP,US);
G06F9/3836 (EP,US);
G06F9/3838 (EP,US);
G06F9/3867 (EP,US);
G06F9/3879 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/15] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2005/18] |
Former [2003/42] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwaltung eines FIFO zur Abalufverfolgung | [2005/15] | English: | Trace fifo management | [2000/15] | French: | Gestion de fifo de traçage | [2000/15] |
Former [2000/15] | Ablaufverfolgungsfifoverwaltung | Examination procedure | 29.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Request for further processing for: | 25.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.09.2005 | NL | 28.09.2005 | SE | 28.12.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/22] | NL | 28.09.2005 | |
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | SE | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5724505 (ARGADE PRAMOD VASANT [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8,9,12,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 65 * * column 5, line 2 - line 8 * * column 5, line 34 - line 57 * * column 6, line 19 - line 39 *; | [A]US5564028 (SWOBODA GARY L [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0762276 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 10, line 50 - page 18, line 18 * * figure 3 * |