EP0928869 - Locking armature for door, window-door or the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | Revocation of patent | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERCO INTERNATIONAL Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment, Société Anonyme 2, rue du Vieux Moulin, Reding 57400 Sarrebourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states FERCO INTERNATIONAL Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment Société Anonyme 2, rue du Vieux Moulin, Reding 57400 Sarrebourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prevot, Gérard 39, rue de Herbitzheim 57430 Willerwald / FR | 02 /
Collet, Jean-Yves 3, rue du Couvent 67700 Saint-Jean-Saverne / FR | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 8, Avenue Pierre Mendès France 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 99440001.8 | 04.01.1999 | [1999/28] | Priority number, date | FR19980000284 | 09.01.1998 Original published format: FR 9800284 | FR19980003504 | 18.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9803504 | [1999/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928869 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0928869 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05B63/20 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
E05B63/20 (EP,US);
E05B2063/207 (EP,US);
E05C9/002 (EP,US);
Y10S292/24 (EP,US);
Y10T292/098 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1016 (EP,US);
Y10T292/558 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/12] |
Former [1999/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verriegelungsbeschlag für Tür, Fenstertür oder dergleichen | [1999/28] | English: | Locking armature for door, window-door or the same | [1999/28] | French: | Ferrure de verrouillage pour porte, porte-fenêtre ou analogue | [1999/28] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 19.04.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse D-48291 Telgte / DE Opponent's representative Ruttensperger, Bernhard Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse D-48291 Telgte / DE Opponent's representative Ruttensperger, Bernhard, Dipl.-Phys. Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | 22.05.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.09.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.2001 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2002 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.02.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2500874 (FERCO INT USINE FERRURES [FR]) [DA] 1* the whole document * |