blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0951061

EP0951061 - Method for forming a FET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2008
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]For all designated states
INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Badenes, Gonçal
Naamsestraat 148/1
3000 Leuven / BE
02 / Deferm, Ludo
Braamstraat 82
3581 Beverlo / BE
03 / Beckx, Stephan
Prins Delignestraat 30
3001 Leuven / BE
04 / Vanhaelemeersch, Serge
Kapelberg 56
3001 Leuven / BE
[1999/42]
Representative(s)Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al
pronovem - Office Van Malderen
Avenue Josse Goffin 158
1082 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]Van Malderen, Joelle, et al
Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1
1083 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date99870060.329.03.1999
[1999/42]
Priority number, dateEP1998087006431.03.1998         Original published format: EP 98870064
US19980086468P22.05.1998         Original published format: US 86468 P
[1999/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0951061
Date:20.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0951061
Date:09.07.2003
[2003/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2003
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H01L21/265
[2003/28]
CPC:
H10D30/0227 (EP); H01L21/31116 (EP); H10D30/0229 (EP);
H10D64/015 (EP)
Former IPC [1999/42]H01L21/336, H01L29/78
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/14]
Former [1999/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von einem FET[1999/42]
English:Method for forming a FET[1999/42]
French:Méthode de fabrication d'un FET[1999/42]
Examination procedure23.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
30.12.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.04.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE
19.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/18]
13.12.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.02.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.02.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4818714  (HASKELL JACOB D [US]);
 [A]EP0456318  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]);
 [A]US5290720  (CHEN MIN-LIANG [US]);
 [A]US5573965  (CHEN MIN-LIANG [US], et al);
 [A]US5641698  (LIN JENGPING [TW]);
 [Y]US5679589  (LEE KUO-HUA [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.