Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992590

EP0992590 - Process for bright annealing metals having high oxygen affinity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.10.2005  [2005/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ebner, Peter Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Bergham 168
4060 Leonding / AT
For all designated states
Lochner, Heribert, Dipl.-Ing.
Burgwallstrasse 19
4060 Leonding / AT
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Hübscher, Helmut , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher
Postfach 411
4010 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2005/21]Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7
4021 Linz / AT
Former [2001/15]Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7
4021 Linz / AT
Former [2000/15]Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Spittelwiese 7
4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date99890293.614.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateAT1998000166205.10.1998         Original published format: AT 166298
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992590
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C21D1/74
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Blankglühen von eine hohe Affinität zu Sauerstoff aufweisenden Metallen[2000/15]
English:Process for bright annealing metals having high oxygen affinity[2000/15]
French:Procédé pour recuire à blanc des métaux à affinité élevée pour l'oxygène[2000/15]
Examination procedure28.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
27.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/40]
03.05.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
07.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4336771  (LOI IND OFENANLAGEN [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 23 - line 51 *;
 [Y]FR2653448  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [Y] 1 * claims 1,2 *;
 [Y]JPS5989725  ;
 [A]US4744837  (BROCKINGTON JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3931195  (BANDSTAHLKOMBINAT MATERN VEB [DD]) [A] 2 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPS5292813  ;
 [A]JPS6311616
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840912), vol. 008, no. 199, Database accession no. (C - 242), & JP59089725 A 19840524 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU KK) [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 37, Database accession no. 1977-65814Y, XP002127938 & JPS5292813 A 19770804 (NIIGATA ENG CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880617), vol. 012, no. 213, Database accession no. (C - 505), & JP63011616 A 19880119 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *